THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Accuro
Unit 1B
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Baird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Accuro
Unit 1B
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Baird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970