THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:55:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 06 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael McGrath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 06 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael McGrath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970