THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:56:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1965
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Nov 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Helen Hai Yin Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2020:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ho’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
Dr. Ho will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

Dr. Ho will engage in professional education, including in screening, medical record keeping and preventative health.

Dr. Ho’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Nov 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Helen Hai Yin Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2020:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ho’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
Dr. Ho will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

Dr. Ho will engage in professional education, including in screening, medical record keeping and preventative health.

Dr. Ho’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 
 

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Apr 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Dec 1967