THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:14:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter C. Noble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter C. Noble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER CHARLES NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER CHARLES NOBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1971