THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:03:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 1973

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1971