THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For those patients who intend to continue on with Dr. Mingo and have seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the records will be moved to:

Suite 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto, ON
M4X 1W4

For those patients who have not seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the Records will be stored at:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Jul 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For those patients who intend to continue on with Dr. Mingo and have seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the records will be moved to:

Suite 212
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto, ON
M4X 1W4

For those patients who have not seen either Dr. Fitzsimmons or Dr. Mingo since January 1, 2009, the Records will be stored at:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Jul 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2011


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1970