THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip F. Stuart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip F. Stuart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 10 Jan 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Frazer Stuart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2022:

Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Stuart’s record-keeping and compliance with age-related screens in his family practice. As Dr. Stuart was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Stuart agreeing to resign from the College effective May 31, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 10 Jan 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Frazer Stuart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2022:

Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Stuart’s record-keeping and compliance with age-related screens in his family practice. As Dr. Stuart was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Stuart agreeing to resign from the College effective May 31, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1970