THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Science Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London, Ontario
N6A 5W9
Date Received: 30 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Clifton Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London Health Science Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London, Ontario
N6A 5W9
Date Received: 30 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Clifton Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1971