THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 07 Dec 1992
Summary of Decision:
In a decision which was released in December 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Morissette guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Morissette was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Morissette s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 36 months. This suspension was itself to be suspended on the following terms and conditions:

(a) Dr. Morissette was to continue in therapy with his present psychiatrist or an alternative therapist suggested by him and approved by the Registrar.

(b) Dr. Morissette was to continue regularly to participate in the programs directed by Alcoholics Anonymous and his community s Professional Support Group.

(c) Dr. Morissette was to continue to participate in a program of psychotherapeutic training under his present Director or an alternate suggested by him and approved by the Registrar.

(d) The suspension of Dr. Morissette s suspension was to be dependent upon reports being submitted every six months to the Registrar which, in his sole judgment, were deemed to be satisfactory.

(e) Dr. Morissette was not to enter into psychotherapeutic treatment with a female patient for a period of one year; thereafter, he was to be permitted to commence such therapy upon the approval of his psychiatrist and Director, or their alternates.

3. In the event that, in the judgment of the Registrar, Dr. Morissette failed to comply with any of these terms and conditions, the full suspension was to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, not to exceed sixty days from the date on which the default, in the opinion of the Registrar, had occurred.

4. If Dr. Morissette s actions were the subject of a subsequent Hearing before the Discipline Committee of the College, the record of this Hearing was to form part of that procedure.
 
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Jan 1992

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Aug 2015
Summary:
Dr. Morissette has been the subject of College investigations into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct, including by breaching his undertaking to the College and practicing medicine while incapacitated, including prescribing medications, providing medical opinions and/or assessments, and seeing patients. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Morissette resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 07 Dec 1992
Summary of Decision:
In a decision which was released in December 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Morissette guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Morissette was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Morissette s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 36 months. This suspension was itself to be suspended on the following terms and conditions:

(a) Dr. Morissette was to continue in therapy with his present psychiatrist or an alternative therapist suggested by him and approved by the Registrar.

(b) Dr. Morissette was to continue regularly to participate in the programs directed by Alcoholics Anonymous and his community s Professional Support Group.

(c) Dr. Morissette was to continue to participate in a program of psychotherapeutic training under his present Director or an alternate suggested by him and approved by the Registrar.

(d) The suspension of Dr. Morissette s suspension was to be dependent upon reports being submitted every six months to the Registrar which, in his sole judgment, were deemed to be satisfactory.

(e) Dr. Morissette was not to enter into psychotherapeutic treatment with a female patient for a period of one year; thereafter, he was to be permitted to commence such therapy upon the approval of his psychiatrist and Director, or their alternates.

3. In the event that, in the judgment of the Registrar, Dr. Morissette failed to comply with any of these terms and conditions, the full suspension was to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, not to exceed sixty days from the date on which the default, in the opinion of the Registrar, had occurred.

4. If Dr. Morissette s actions were the subject of a subsequent Hearing before the Discipline Committee of the College, the record of this Hearing was to form part of that procedure.
 
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Jan 1992

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Aug 2015
Summary:
Dr. Morissette has been the subject of College investigations into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct, including by breaching his undertaking to the College and practicing medicine while incapacitated, including prescribing medications, providing medical opinions and/or assessments, and seeing patients. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Morissette resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 May 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970