THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 05 Oct 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lloyd Gregory Padmore to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2016:

Dr. Padmore’s practice is restricted to office-based obstetrics and gynaecology. He may not practise family medicine.

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
May 3, 2022, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Lloyd Padmore in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2009.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 05 Oct 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lloyd Gregory Padmore to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2016:

Dr. Padmore’s practice is restricted to office-based obstetrics and gynaecology. He may not practise family medicine.

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
May 3, 2022, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Lloyd Padmore in respect of an incident that took place in April, 2009.

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 1971