THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:53:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East-mailbox#70
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)308-5388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clive Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East-mailbox#70
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)308-5388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093

www.recordsregistry.ca

or

13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clive Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLIVE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLIVE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1972