THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Instructions/Address: RSRS Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-888-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Instructions/Address: RSRS Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-888-398-5932
Date Received: 26 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1972