THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:41:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert E. Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert E. Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1971