THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Advanced MD Urgent Care
Suite 125
289 South Pelham Road
Welland, ON L3C 3C7
Date Received: 30 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lars Refling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Aug 2017

Corporation Name: Refling Braithwaite-Walton Zides Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Advanced MD Urgent Care
Suite 125
289 South Pelham Road
Welland, ON L3C 3C7
Date Received: 30 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lars Refling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Aug 2017

Corporation Name: Refling Braithwaite-Walton Zides Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Mar 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2017


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1971