THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:44:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1959
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact the appropriate address above depending on where you were seen as a patient by Dr. T.K. Pain.
1. Lockwood Clinic, Unit 320, 790 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5G 1N8 Telephone: 416-921-2121

2. Beharry Medical Centre, 567 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON MS 2P8 Telephone: 416-964-8572

3. King & Dufferin Medical Clinic, Suite 5,1209 King Street West, M6K 1G2 Telephone: 416-536-2500
Date Received: 15 Jan 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact the appropriate address above depending on where you were seen as a patient by Dr. T.K. Pain.
1. Lockwood Clinic, Unit 320, 790 Bay Street, Toronto, ON M5G 1N8 Telephone: 416-921-2121

2. Beharry Medical Centre, 567 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON MS 2P8 Telephone: 416-964-8572

3. King & Dufferin Medical Clinic, Suite 5,1209 King Street West, M6K 1G2 Telephone: 416-536-2500
Date Received: 15 Jan 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1959

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1972