THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:13:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients seen at Belleville General Hospital please contact:

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville, ON K8N 5A9

For patients seen at the Princess Street office in Kingston please write to:
Dr. J.E. Arboleda-Florez
483 River Ridge Drive
Glenburnie, ON K0H 1S0
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients seen at Belleville General Hospital please contact:

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville, ON K8N 5A9

For patients seen at the Princess Street office in Kingston please write to:
Dr. J.E. Arboleda-Florez
483 River Ridge Drive
Glenburnie, ON K0H 1S0
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Colombia, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1966
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1972

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 1966