THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:40:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Mar 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Provis Rudd Clinic
123 Edward St
Toronto, ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 25 Feb 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Mar 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Provis Rudd Clinic
123 Edward St
Toronto, ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 25 Feb 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Apr 1995
Summary of Decision:
In April 1995, Dr. de la Rocha pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s.61(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.

The Discipline Committe accepted Dr. de la Rocha s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct.

Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. de la Rocha's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of ninety days.

2. This period of suspension was itself to be suspended, provided that Dr. de la Rocha, within fifteen days after the date upon which this Order became final, filed a written undertaking with the Registrar to prepare a proposal for a protocol for use in community hospitals, concerning the withdrawal of life support from terminally ill patients, and provided further that:
(a) he submitted to the Registrar, within thirty days of filing the written undertaking, an organizational plan for the development of the proposal for the protocol;

(b) the proposal for the protocol addressed the pharmacological management of symptoms, as well as the subjects of informal consent, ethics, patient autonomy, and the involvement of the family and the family physician in the decision-making process;

(c) in the course of preparation of the protocol, Dr. de la Rocha reviewed relevant literature and consulted widely with experts in palliative care, ethics and critical care, and with patients' rights organizations;

(d) the proposal for a protocol was of such a quality as to render it suitable for submission to a peer-reviewed journal, and was submitted by Dr. de la Rocha for consideration for publication by such a journal;

(e) Dr. de la Rocha, within 270 days of filing the written undertaking, submitted to the Registrar a copy of the proposal for a protocol, and also written confirmation that he complied with sections 2(b), 2(c) and 2(d) cited above.

3. In the event that, having filed the written undertaking referred to in section 2 above, Dr. de la Rocha failed to comply with the deadlines contained in sections 2(a) or 2(e) cited above, his licence to practice would thereupon be suspended for a period of ninety days, such suspension to commence immediately following such failure to comply.

4. These penalties were to be recorded in the Register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 03, 1995

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Sep 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Apr 1995
Summary of Decision:
In April 1995, Dr. de la Rocha pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s.61(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.

The Discipline Committe accepted Dr. de la Rocha s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct.

Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. de la Rocha's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of ninety days.

2. This period of suspension was itself to be suspended, provided that Dr. de la Rocha, within fifteen days after the date upon which this Order became final, filed a written undertaking with the Registrar to prepare a proposal for a protocol for use in community hospitals, concerning the withdrawal of life support from terminally ill patients, and provided further that:
(a) he submitted to the Registrar, within thirty days of filing the written undertaking, an organizational plan for the development of the proposal for the protocol;

(b) the proposal for the protocol addressed the pharmacological management of symptoms, as well as the subjects of informal consent, ethics, patient autonomy, and the involvement of the family and the family physician in the decision-making process;

(c) in the course of preparation of the protocol, Dr. de la Rocha reviewed relevant literature and consulted widely with experts in palliative care, ethics and critical care, and with patients' rights organizations;

(d) the proposal for a protocol was of such a quality as to render it suitable for submission to a peer-reviewed journal, and was submitted by Dr. de la Rocha for consideration for publication by such a journal;

(e) Dr. de la Rocha, within 270 days of filing the written undertaking, submitted to the Registrar a copy of the proposal for a protocol, and also written confirmation that he complied with sections 2(b), 2(c) and 2(d) cited above.

3. In the event that, having filed the written undertaking referred to in section 2 above, Dr. de la Rocha failed to comply with the deadlines contained in sections 2(a) or 2(e) cited above, his licence to practice would thereupon be suspended for a period of ninety days, such suspension to commence immediately following such failure to comply.

4. These penalties were to be recorded in the Register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 03, 1995

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Sep 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1969