THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:44:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1965
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933-2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 19 Feb 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a written request to Dr. Grosett's practice address:

324 College Street
Toronto, ON
M5T 1S3
Date Received: 01 Dec 2011

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933-2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 19 Feb 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a written request to Dr. Grosett's practice address:

324 College Street
Toronto, ON
M5T 1S3
Date Received: 01 Dec 2011

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968