THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:03:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 27 Feb 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 27 Feb 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 May 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1972