THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1971
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 127 Park Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-1451
Fax: (519) 743-8220
Address: Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Box 870
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Carleton, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 127 Park Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 1Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-1451
Fax: (519) 743-8220
Address: Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Box 870
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 17 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Carleton, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ANDREA CARLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN ANDREA CARLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 May 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1974

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 May 1974

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1972

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971