THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:52:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Apr 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Samuel Charles Eberhard to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 2, 2024.
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into  Dr. Eberhard’s care of, and conduct towards, a patient in his general medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Eberhard will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Eberhard will engage in professional education, including in prescribing, medical record-keeping, professional boundaries, and communication.

Dr. Eberhard’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Apr 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Samuel Charles Eberhard to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 2, 2024.
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into  Dr. Eberhard’s care of, and conduct towards, a patient in his general medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Eberhard will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Eberhard will engage in professional education, including in prescribing, medical record-keeping, professional boundaries, and communication.

Dr. Eberhard’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1972