THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:08:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1972
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1972
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Mar 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Riddle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 23, 2016:

Dr. Riddle was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his standard of practice and his conduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Riddle has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Mar 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Riddle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 23, 2016:

Dr. Riddle was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his standard of practice and his conduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Riddle has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 1973

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970