THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:00:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: J.E. Purkyne University, 1968
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
3rd Floor
Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 5945
Fax: (416) 864-5953

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 14 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, GERMAN
Medical School: J.E. Purkyne University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
3rd Floor
Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 5945
Fax: (416) 864-5953

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 14 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE VANEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE VANEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: J.E. Purkyne University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1970
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1975

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1975

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 1970