THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:29:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may submit a request for their medical records to RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 or by visiting www.recordsolutions.ca/drpeoples
Date Received: 21 Sep 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Peoples Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Feb 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may submit a request for their medical records to RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 or by visiting www.recordsolutions.ca/drpeoples
Date Received: 21 Sep 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Peoples Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Feb 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Jun 1991
Summary of Decision:
In June 1991, Dr. Peoples pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Peoples guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Peoples be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; that he be fined $3000.00; and that, should the Doctor fail to pay the fine and/or fail to present himself for the reprimand within sixty days of the Order becoming final, his licence to practice would be suspended until the terms were satisfied.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 13 Jun 1991

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Peoples to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into Dr. Peoples’ general medicine practice. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Peoples resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Jun 1991
Summary of Decision:
In June 1991, Dr. Peoples pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Peoples guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Peoples be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; that he be fined $3000.00; and that, should the Doctor fail to pay the fine and/or fail to present himself for the reprimand within sixty days of the Order becoming final, his licence to practice would be suspended until the terms were satisfied.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 13 Jun 1991

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Peoples to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into Dr. Peoples’ general medicine practice. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Peoples resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 1969