THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:53:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 374 Clarke Ave
Montreal, Quebec
H3Z 2E6
Date Received: 08 Jul 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 374 Clarke Ave
Montreal, Quebec
H3Z 2E6
Date Received: 08 Jul 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1972