THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:02:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicolaas Buma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicolaas Buma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Jul 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nicholaas Harmen Buma to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 7, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Buma’s knowledge, skill and judgment in his endoscopy practice. As a result, Dr. Buma must not engage in the practice of endoscopies until he provides 45 days’ notice to the College of his intent to do so. If Dr. Buma resumes performing such procedures, his practice will be assessed. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 07 Jul 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nicholaas Harmen Buma to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 7, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Buma’s knowledge, skill and judgment in his endoscopy practice. As a result, Dr. Buma must not engage in the practice of endoscopies until he provides 45 days’ notice to the College of his intent to do so. If Dr. Buma resumes performing such procedures, his practice will be assessed. 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 1973