THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request c/o Dr. Leon Bhatia to: 855 Broadview Ave. Suite 405, Toronto ON, M4K 3Z1 or via telephone at (416) 967-9220 or via Fax: (416) 967-9276
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.K. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request c/o Dr. Leon Bhatia to: 855 Broadview Ave. Suite 405, Toronto ON, M4K 3Z1 or via telephone at (416) 967-9220 or via Fax: (416) 967-9276
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.K. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971