THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Files have been stored as per above.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
111 Regis Cres S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-342-1052
Date Received: 05 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.R. Faulkner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Mar 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Files have been stored as per above.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
111 Regis Cres S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-342-1052
Date Received: 05 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.R. Faulkner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Mar 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Apr 2001
Summary of Decision:
On April 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Faulkner(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct with regard to the following:
Failing to fulfil terms of an agreement for professional services;
Failure without reasonable cause to provide a report or certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by the member to his patient or his authorized agent;
Failure to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College;
Engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee directed the following penalty:

Recorded reprimand;
Costs awarded to the College in the amount of $6,500 to be paid within 30 days;
One-month suspension to commence no later than May 31, 2001;
Peer assessment of office practice and office inspection to be conducted within one year at Dr. Faulkner(s expense with the results to be reported to the Registrar who is directed to take appropriate action if the results are unsatisfactory.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 26, 2001

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Apr 2001
Summary of Decision:
On April 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Faulkner(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct with regard to the following:
Failing to fulfil terms of an agreement for professional services;
Failure without reasonable cause to provide a report or certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by the member to his patient or his authorized agent;
Failure to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College;
Engaging in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee directed the following penalty:

Recorded reprimand;
Costs awarded to the College in the amount of $6,500 to be paid within 30 days;
One-month suspension to commence no later than May 31, 2001;
Peer assessment of office practice and office inspection to be conducted within one year at Dr. Faulkner(s expense with the results to be reported to the Registrar who is directed to take appropriate action if the results are unsatisfactory.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 26, 2001

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 18 Jun 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 May 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 18 May 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 1973