THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:47:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1972