THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:56:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 15 Runnymede Crescent
London ON, N6G 1Z7
Date Received: 26 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.P. Potter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 15 Runnymede Crescent
London ON, N6G 1Z7
Date Received: 26 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.P. Potter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 Mar 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Peter Potter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 30, 2017:

Dr. Potter has restricted his practice to addiction medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 Mar 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Peter Potter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 30, 2017:

Dr. Potter has restricted his practice to addiction medicine.

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1973