THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2209 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-7610
Fax: (416) 766-5398

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2209 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-7610
Fax: (416) 766-5398

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
10 Jan 2005
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 10 2005
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 11, 2005, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario imposes the following terms, conditions and limitations
on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George William Skocylak:

a) that Dr. Skocylak's privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled
drugs are suspended;

b) that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s)
advising his patients of his suspension of privileges to prescribe
narcotics and controlled drugs; and

c) that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the
terms of the Discipline Committee's Order, his certificate of
registration shall be immediately suspended for the remainder of
the six-month period.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 11, 2005, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario imposes the following terms, conditions and limitations
on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George William Skocylak:

a) that Dr. Skocylak's privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled
drugs are suspended;

b) that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s)
advising his patients of his suspension of privileges to prescribe
narcotics and controlled drugs; and

c) that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the
terms of the Discipline Committee's Order, his certificate of
registration shall be immediately suspended for the remainder of
the six-month period.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 24 Mar 2006
Summary of Decision:
On March 24, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he had engaged in conduct or an act relavant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration by prescribing drugs with a controlled drug content to a patient in contravention of a Discipline Committee order prohibiting him from doing so.

The Discipline Committee directed and ordered that:

1. Dr. Skocylak's certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 4 months commencing on April 17, 2006.

2. Dr. Skocylak be subject to quarterly random chart reviews for 2 years at his own expense, by a member of the College, approved by the Registrar.

3. The previously ordered terms, conditions and limitation imposed by the Discipline Committee on January 10, 2005 will remain in effect as follows:

i. Dr. Skocylak(s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended; and

ii. Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 24, 2006

Date of Decision: 10 Jan 2005
Summary of Decision:
On January 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice by failing to honour an undertaking given to the College to surrender his privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.

As well, Dr. Skocylak mailed post-dated prescriptions to a patient for medication with either a narcotic or a controlled drug content.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:
1) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, four (4) months of which shall be suspended upon Dr. Skocylak s successful completion of the College s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course by no later than April 14, 2005 and the College s Physicians Prescribing Skills course by no later than April 14, 2005.

2) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to commence the suspension of Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration on February 14, 2005.

3) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time
:

a) that Dr. Skocylak s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended;

b) that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s) advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs; and

c) that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the terms of this Order, his certificate of registration shall be immediately suspended for the remainder of the six (6) month period.

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 10, 2005

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 24 Mar 2006
Summary of Decision:
On March 24, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he had engaged in conduct or an act relavant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration by prescribing drugs with a controlled drug content to a patient in contravention of a Discipline Committee order prohibiting him from doing so.

The Discipline Committee directed and ordered that:

1. Dr. Skocylak's certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 4 months commencing on April 17, 2006.

2. Dr. Skocylak be subject to quarterly random chart reviews for 2 years at his own expense, by a member of the College, approved by the Registrar.

3. The previously ordered terms, conditions and limitation imposed by the Discipline Committee on January 10, 2005 will remain in effect as follows:

i. Dr. Skocylak(s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended; and

ii. Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 24, 2006

Date of Decision: 10 Jan 2005
Summary of Decision:
On January 10, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Skocylak to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice by failing to honour an undertaking given to the College to surrender his privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs.

As well, Dr. Skocylak mailed post-dated prescriptions to a patient for medication with either a narcotic or a controlled drug content.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:
1) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, four (4) months of which shall be suspended upon Dr. Skocylak s successful completion of the College s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course by no later than April 14, 2005 and the College s Physicians Prescribing Skills course by no later than April 14, 2005.

2) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to commence the suspension of Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration on February 14, 2005.

3) The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Skocylak s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time
:

a) that Dr. Skocylak s privileges to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs be suspended;

b) that Dr. Skocylak prominently display a sign in his office(s) advising his patients of his suspension in privileges to prescribe narcotics and controlled drugs; and

c) that in the event that Dr. Skocylak fails to comply with any of the terms of this Order, his certificate of registration shall be immediately suspended for the remainder of the six (6) month period.

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 10, 2005

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2006
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 15 Apr 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1973