THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:12:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 2588710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-613 Longfield Drive
Nepean Ontario K2J 6J2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 2588710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-613 Longfield Drive
Nepean Ontario K2J 6J2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENIS KWOK TAI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENIS KWOK TAI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1973