THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
51 Waterloo Avenue
Toronto ON M3H 3Y1
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
51 Waterloo Avenue
Toronto ON M3H 3Y1
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 28 Oct 2020
Summary of Decision:
On June 26, 2019, allegations of Dr. Herman’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that in or about 1997, Dr. Herman engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient, who was a teenager at the time.

The matter was heard on October 28, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence of counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Herman. On the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leon Herman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient; and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Disposition

On October 29, 2020, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that:

- the Registrar revoke Dr. Herman’s certificate of registration effective immediately;
- Dr. Herman appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
- Dr. Herman reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this order in the amount of $16,060.00; and
- Dr. Herman pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

On January 19, 2021, the Committee released its reasons for decision. The reasons may be viewed on the website of the College.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Date: October 28, 2020

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 28 Oct 2020
Summary of Decision:
On June 26, 2019, allegations of Dr. Herman’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that in or about 1997, Dr. Herman engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient, who was a teenager at the time.

The matter was heard on October 28, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence of counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Herman. On the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leon Herman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient; and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Disposition

On October 29, 2020, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that:

- the Registrar revoke Dr. Herman’s certificate of registration effective immediately;
- Dr. Herman appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
- Dr. Herman reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this order in the amount of $16,060.00; and
- Dr. Herman pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

On January 19, 2021, the Committee released its reasons for decision. The reasons may be viewed on the website of the College.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Date: October 28, 2020

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 Oct 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1973