THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:07:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hans Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hans Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1977

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1972