THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:54:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patrick Barnabe to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 12, 2019:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Barnabe’s practice. As a result:

• Dr. Barnabe has agreed to resign from the College effective January 2, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

• Dr. Barnabe will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until January 2, 2020. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patrick Barnabe to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 12, 2019:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Barnabe’s practice. As a result:

• Dr. Barnabe has agreed to resign from the College effective January 2, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

• Dr. Barnabe will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until January 2, 2020. 

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jan 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1973