THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact Dr. John Yoo for medical records.
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON N6A 5W9
Tel: 519 685 8500 ext. 55699
Fax: 519 685 8468
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan MacRae Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Nov 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact Dr. John Yoo for medical records.
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON N6A 5W9
Tel: 519 685 8500 ext. 55699
Fax: 519 685 8468
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan MacRae Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Nov 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1973