THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:08:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Otago, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Donald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Otago, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Donald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Otago, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1973

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1972