THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:48:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Cordoba, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 Mar 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Michaels's Hospital
30 Bond St.
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 1W8
Date Received: 23 Apr 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martoglio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Cordoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 Mar 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Michaels's Hospital
30 Bond St.
Toronto, Ontario
M5G 1W8
Date Received: 23 Apr 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martoglio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Cordoba, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968