THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Fred Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2019

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Fred Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2019

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 15 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1972