THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:43:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GANDA, SOGA, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Sharon Kour
email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2010

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Ms. Stella Sight
Unit 516
1280 Finch Avenue West
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 3K6
Date Received: 09 Jan 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GANDA, SOGA, SWAHILI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Sharon Kour
email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2010

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Ms. Stella Sight
Unit 516
1280 Finch Avenue West
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 3K6
Date Received: 09 Jan 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 08 Feb 2010
Summary of Decision:
On February 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe’s admission and found that Dr. Kitakufe engaged in acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and that he has committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On August 29, 2007, Dr. Kitakufe pleaded guilty to, and was convicted of the criminal charges of: unlawfully conspired to commit Fraud exceeding $5000, by participation in a scheme to defraud the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care through the use of fraudulent prescriptions for oxycodone; unlawfully conspired to commit the indictable offence of Trafficking in a controlled substance, oxycodone; and, unlawfully by deceit, falsehood or other fraudulent means, defrauded the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care of money of a value exceeding $5000 by submitting fraudulent claims for medical services, for which the Ministry remitted payment. Dr. Kitakufe was sentenced to 32 months in custody and ordered to pay restitution in the amount of $50,000.

After hearing submissions and evidence on penalty, the Committee reserved its decision on penalty on March 3, 2010. On September 3, 2010, the Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Kitakufe appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2. The Registrar revoke Dr. Kitakufe’s certificate of registration effective immediately.

The Committee also ordered that Dr. Kitakufe shall pay to the College its costs fixed at $18,250.00 within six (6) months of the date of this order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 8-12, March 3, 2010
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 18 Oct 2021
    Decision: Application Denied

Date of Decision: 12 Feb 2001
Summary of Decision:
On February 12, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise by another jurisdiction (United States District Court, Northern District of Illinois.)

In accordance with the Consent Disposition, the Discipline Committee Ordered:

1) that Dr. Kitakufe's certificate of registration be suspended for six months; the six months having been served from October 1, 1999, to April 1, 2000;
2) the Registrar is directed to impose terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Kitakufe's certificate of registration that he may continue to practise only if and as long as he:

(A) permits the College to monitor his accounts to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan approximately annually;
(B) authorizes the College to obtain information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan about his billings to the Plan;
(C) pays the expenses of the monitoring in an amount not to exceed $3,500 per year within 60 days of being billed for the expenses for a period of five years from the date of the Order.
3) recorded reprimand;
4) costs, in the amount of $3,750 to be paid to the College by March 30, 2001.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 12, 2001

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 08 Feb 2010
Summary of Decision:
On February 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe’s admission and found that Dr. Kitakufe engaged in acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and that he has committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On August 29, 2007, Dr. Kitakufe pleaded guilty to, and was convicted of the criminal charges of: unlawfully conspired to commit Fraud exceeding $5000, by participation in a scheme to defraud the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care through the use of fraudulent prescriptions for oxycodone; unlawfully conspired to commit the indictable offence of Trafficking in a controlled substance, oxycodone; and, unlawfully by deceit, falsehood or other fraudulent means, defrauded the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care of money of a value exceeding $5000 by submitting fraudulent claims for medical services, for which the Ministry remitted payment. Dr. Kitakufe was sentenced to 32 months in custody and ordered to pay restitution in the amount of $50,000.

After hearing submissions and evidence on penalty, the Committee reserved its decision on penalty on March 3, 2010. On September 3, 2010, the Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Kitakufe appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2. The Registrar revoke Dr. Kitakufe’s certificate of registration effective immediately.

The Committee also ordered that Dr. Kitakufe shall pay to the College its costs fixed at $18,250.00 within six (6) months of the date of this order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 8-12, March 3, 2010
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 18 Oct 2021
    Decision: Application Denied

Date of Decision: 12 Feb 2001
Summary of Decision:
On February 12, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise by another jurisdiction (United States District Court, Northern District of Illinois.)

In accordance with the Consent Disposition, the Discipline Committee Ordered:

1) that Dr. Kitakufe's certificate of registration be suspended for six months; the six months having been served from October 1, 1999, to April 1, 2000;
2) the Registrar is directed to impose terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Kitakufe's certificate of registration that he may continue to practise only if and as long as he:

(A) permits the College to monitor his accounts to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan approximately annually;
(B) authorizes the College to obtain information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan about his billings to the Plan;
(C) pays the expenses of the monitoring in an amount not to exceed $3,500 per year within 60 days of being billed for the expenses for a period of five years from the date of the Order.
3) recorded reprimand;
4) costs, in the amount of $3,750 to be paid to the College by March 30, 2001.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 12, 2001

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 01 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Feb 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 May 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2001

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2000


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 1981

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1972