THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:07:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2012



DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1972