THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:41:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 8 - 65 Angeline St North
Lindsay, Ontario
K9V 5N7
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. James Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 8 - 65 Angeline St North
Lindsay, Ontario
K9V 5N7
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. James Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 1974