THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:44:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Taiwan University, 1965
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: National Taiwan University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Mar 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dig Sung Lee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2017:

Dr. Lee was the subject of complaints which led to College investigations into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Lee has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Mar 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dig Sung Lee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2017:

Dr. Lee was the subject of complaints which led to College investigations into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Lee has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: National Taiwan University, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 1974