THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:19:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Insight Diagnostics
658 Danforth Ave.
Toronto ON
M4J 5B9
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4655735
Fax: (416) 4651402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1979
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Insight Diagnostics
658 Danforth Ave.
Toronto ON
M4J 5B9
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 4655735
Fax: (416) 4651402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1979
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MAUREEN TAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA MAUREEN TAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 1974

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1972