THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:28:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Cundles Road East
Suite 309
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 737-4641
Fax: (705) 737-9605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Cundles Road East
Suite 309
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 737-4641
Fax: (705) 737-9605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH KRAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH KRAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1974
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 1974