THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:56:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 704 Briar Hill Ave
Toronto Ontario M6B 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 7817858
Fax: (416) 781-3253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests can be emailed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Jan 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian N. Hanick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanick (CPSO#: 26509 )
Business Address: 702 - 120 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E2
(416) 322-3522
Business Address: 704 Briar Hill Ave 4167817858

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 704 Briar Hill Ave
Toronto Ontario M6B 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 7817858
Fax: (416) 781-3253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests can be emailed to: [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Jan 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian N. Hanick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanick (CPSO#: 26509 )
Business Address: 702 - 120 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E2
(416) 322-3522
Business Address: 704 Briar Hill Ave 4167817858

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN NATHANIEL HANICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIAN NATHANIEL HANICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1974