THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Killaloe Medical Center
R R 2
45 Mill Street
Killaloe Ontario K0J 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 757-2095
Fax: (613) 757-3680
Address: Valley Manor Nursing Home
88 Mintha
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: (613) 756-2643
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Killaloe Medical Center
R R 2
45 Mill Street
Killaloe Ontario K0J 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 757-2095
Fax: (613) 757-3680
Address: Valley Manor Nursing Home
88 Mintha
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: (613) 756-2643
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jan 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 18 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Undertaking 1 of 2

As from December 23, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich
Tiedje, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiedje to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. INGO ERICH HEINRICH TIEDJE
("Dr. Tiedje")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

(2) I, Dr. Tiedje, certificate of registration number 26517, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately ("Effective Date").

(4) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the
Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
"B";

(ii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
visit;

(iii) Meet with me once every month for the first six (6) months,
and then at the ninth (9th) month and at the twelfth (12th)
month of the Clinical Supervision;

(iv) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(v) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
ongoing professional development and inquire into my
compliance with the recommendations;

(vi) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
Supervision; and

(vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
concerns about my standard of practice.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
report(s) of the medical inspector dated August 31, 2016, and
concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
professional development.

(e) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within twenty
(20) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that if a person who has given an
undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
College within that time.

(g) I, Dr. Tiedje, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
(f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(h) I, Dr. Tiedje, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
result of section (4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
register.

(5) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to participate in and successfully
complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
Appendix "B.

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to complete this requirement within
the time frame set out in the IEP.

(6) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that, approximately eighteen (18) months
after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
(4) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
Committee.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
regard. I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
be provided to me.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
section (6)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable.

(e) Dr. Tiedje, hereby consent to any of the following being included
on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
Code:

(i) any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
conditions or limitations on my practice;

(ii) any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
section (6)(c) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
practice.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
location.

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
respectively.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(11) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

(12) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(13) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that the Undertaking remains in effect.

(15) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his
standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

* Dr. Tiedje will practise under the guidance of a
Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
twelve (12) months.

* Dr. Tiedje's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
selected by the College within eighteen (18) months of
the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
following information to any person who requires this information for the
purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
out in section (5) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
my completion of the professional education set out in section (5) above,
and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

(a) relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
set out at Appendix "A";

(c) relevant to the Reassessment;

(d) relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
Undertaking; and/or

(e) which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
professional education set out in section (5) above and which he or
she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
patients.


Undertaking 2 of 2

As from May 3, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich
Tiedje, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiedje to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. INGO ERICH HEINRICH TIEDJE
("Dr. Tiedje")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE


(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

(2) I, Dr. Tiedje, certificate of registration number 26517, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, consent to the College sending the Resignation
Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
hereto as Schedule "C")

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
Schedule "D");

and as amended from time to time.

(4) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
substances referred to in section (3)(c) above that are presently in my
possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

(5) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
practice at that location.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." For further
clarity, this sign shall state as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to post a certified translation in any
language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
section (6)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
set out at Schedule "E."
(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to provide to the College the certified
translation(s) described in section (6)(c) prior to beginning to
provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
from the date on which I sign it.

(9) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the
Discipline Committee of the College.

(10) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
my right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
remains in effect.

(13) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his
standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Tiedje must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Tiedje must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS, and
any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order
for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

(17) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Undertaking 1 of 2

As from December 23, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich
Tiedje, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiedje to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. INGO ERICH HEINRICH TIEDJE
("Dr. Tiedje")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

(2) I, Dr. Tiedje, certificate of registration number 26517, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately ("Effective Date").

(4) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the
Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
"B";

(ii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
visit;

(iii) Meet with me once every month for the first six (6) months,
and then at the ninth (9th) month and at the twelfth (12th)
month of the Clinical Supervision;

(iv) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(v) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
ongoing professional development and inquire into my
compliance with the recommendations;

(vi) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
Supervision; and

(vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
concerns about my standard of practice.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
report(s) of the medical inspector dated August 31, 2016, and
concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
professional development.

(e) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within twenty
(20) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that if a person who has given an
undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
College within that time.

(g) I, Dr. Tiedje, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
(f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(h) I, Dr. Tiedje, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
result of section (4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
register.

(5) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to participate in and successfully
complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
Appendix "B.

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to complete this requirement within
the time frame set out in the IEP.

(6) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that, approximately eighteen (18) months
after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
(4) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
Committee.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
regard. I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
be provided to me.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
section (6)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable.

(e) Dr. Tiedje, hereby consent to any of the following being included
on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
Code:

(i) any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
conditions or limitations on my practice;

(ii) any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
section (6)(c) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
practice.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
location.

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
respectively.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(11) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

(12) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(13) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that the Undertaking remains in effect.

(15) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his
standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

* Dr. Tiedje will practise under the guidance of a
Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
twelve (12) months.

* Dr. Tiedje's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
selected by the College within eighteen (18) months of
the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
following information to any person who requires this information for the
purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
out in section (5) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
my completion of the professional education set out in section (5) above,
and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

(a) relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
set out at Appendix "A";

(c) relevant to the Reassessment;

(d) relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
Undertaking; and/or

(e) which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
professional education set out in section (5) above and which he or
she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
patients.


Undertaking 2 of 2

As from May 3, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich
Tiedje, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tiedje to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. INGO ERICH HEINRICH TIEDJE
("Dr. Tiedje")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE


(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

(2) I, Dr. Tiedje, certificate of registration number 26517, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, consent to the College sending the Resignation
Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.

(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
hereto as Schedule "C")

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
Schedule "D");

and as amended from time to time.

(4) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
substances referred to in section (3)(c) above that are presently in my
possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

(5) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
practice at that location.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." For further
clarity, this sign shall state as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

(b) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to post a certified translation in any
language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
section (6)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
set out at Schedule "E."
(c) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake to provide to the College the certified
translation(s) described in section (6)(c) prior to beginning to
provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
from the date on which I sign it.

(9) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the
Discipline Committee of the College.

(10) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
my right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
remains in effect.

(13) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his
standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Tiedje must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Tiedje must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Tiedje, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS, and
any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order
for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Tiedje, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

(17) I, Dr. Tiedje, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Dec 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich Tiedje to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective December 23, 2016:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Tiedje will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
• Dr. Tiedje’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within eighteen (18) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 May 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich Tiedje to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 3, 2016:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Tiedje must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Tiedje must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Dec 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich Tiedje to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective December 23, 2016:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Tiedje will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
• Dr. Tiedje’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within eighteen (18) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 03 May 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ingo Erich Heinrich Tiedje to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 3, 2016:

Dr. Tiedje was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Tiedje must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Tiedje must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Tiedje must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 18 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 25 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Quality Assurance Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1974