THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:19:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record with Dr. Crosby may contact Dr. Rafael Gevorkyan (CPSO# 94751) at:

46 Adam Street
Cambridge, ON
N3C 2K3
Phone: (519) 658-0040
Fax: (888) 651-9747
Date Received: 16 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crosby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record with Dr. Crosby may contact Dr. Rafael Gevorkyan (CPSO# 94751) at:

46 Adam Street
Cambridge, ON
N3C 2K3
Phone: (519) 658-0040
Fax: (888) 651-9747
Date Received: 16 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crosby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Dec 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1973