THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:14:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Holland Street East
P O Box 1510
Bradford Ontario L3Z 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 775-7411
Fax: (905) 775-7666
Address: Georgina Island Centre
R R 2
P O Box N-13
Sutton West Ontario L0E 1R0
Phone: (705) 437-4242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Holland Street East
P O Box 1510
Bradford Ontario L3Z 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 775-7411
Fax: (905) 775-7666
Address: Georgina Island Centre
R R 2
P O Box N-13
Sutton West Ontario L0E 1R0
Phone: (705) 437-4242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
27 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 27 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 27th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lawrence Zsigmond Barcza in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Barcza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. LAWRENCE ZSIGMOND BARCZA
(“Dr. Barcza”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Barcza, certificate of registration number 26610, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-424654-M3D0K7 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my general medicine practice, including in my conduct, office management and infection prevention and control practices.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions
(a) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake that:
(i) I will not reprocess reusable medical equipment in my practice; and
(ii) For all diagnostic and/or surgical procedures, I will only use single-use disposable equipment, including but not limited to scalpels, forceps, scissors, speculums, clamps and needle drivers

(6) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(c) I, Dr. Barcza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(11) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(12) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Barcza engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his general medicine practice, including in his conduct, office management and infection prevention and control practices. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Barcza will not reprocess reusable medical equipment in his practice.

For all diagnostic and/or surgical procedures, Dr. Barcza will only use single-use disposable equipment, including but not limited to scalpels, forceps, scissors, speculums, clamps and needle drivers.

D. CONSENT
(14) I, Dr. Barcza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(15) I, Dr. Barcza, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 27th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lawrence Zsigmond Barcza in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Barcza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. LAWRENCE ZSIGMOND BARCZA
(“Dr. Barcza”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Barcza, certificate of registration number 26610, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-424654-M3D0K7 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my general medicine practice, including in my conduct, office management and infection prevention and control practices.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions
(a) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake that:
(i) I will not reprocess reusable medical equipment in my practice; and
(ii) For all diagnostic and/or surgical procedures, I will only use single-use disposable equipment, including but not limited to scalpels, forceps, scissors, speculums, clamps and needle drivers

(6) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b) I, Dr. Barcza, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(c) I, Dr. Barcza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(d) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(11) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
(12) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Barcza, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Barcza engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his general medicine practice, including in his conduct, office management and infection prevention and control practices. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Barcza will not reprocess reusable medical equipment in his practice.

For all diagnostic and/or surgical procedures, Dr. Barcza will only use single-use disposable equipment, including but not limited to scalpels, forceps, scissors, speculums, clamps and needle drivers.

D. CONSENT
(14) I, Dr. Barcza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(15) I, Dr. Barcza, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Mar 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lawrence Zsigmond Barcza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 27, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Barcza engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his general medicine practice, including in his conduct, office management and infection prevention and control practices. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Barcza will not reprocess reusable medical equipment in his practice.

For all diagnostic and/or surgical procedures, Dr. Barcza will only use single-use disposable equipment, including but not limited to scalpels, forceps, scissors, speculums, clamps and needle drivers.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Mar 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lawrence Zsigmond Barcza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 27, 2024:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Barcza engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his general medicine practice, including in his conduct, office management and infection prevention and control practices. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Barcza will not reprocess reusable medical equipment in his practice.

For all diagnostic and/or surgical procedures, Dr. Barcza will only use single-use disposable equipment, including but not limited to scalpels, forceps, scissors, speculums, clamps and needle drivers.
 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1974