THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:08:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBTIHAL ABDULRAHMAN Y MALAWI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MALAWI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MALAWI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MALAWI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MALAWI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MALAWI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MALAWI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 5 November, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBTIHAL ABDULRAHMAN Y MALAWI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MALAWI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MALAWI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MALAWI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MALAWI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MALAWI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MALAWI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 5 November, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology
01 Jul 2025 to 05 Nov 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology
13 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
21 Oct 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Dermatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 05 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Dermatology
DATE: 13 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Dermatology
DATE: 21 Oct 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 05 Nov 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 05 Nov 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2024